Connecticut 2017 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00575 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-General Assembly Substitute Bill No. 575
2-January Session, 2017 *_____SB00575JUD___040617____*
1+General Assembly Committee Bill No. 575
2+January Session, 2017 LCO No. 4262
3+ *04262SB00575JUD*
4+Referred to Committee on JUDICIARY
5+Introduced by:
6+(JUD)
37
48 General Assembly
59
6-Substitute Bill No. 575
10+Committee Bill No. 575
711
812 January Session, 2017
913
10-*_____SB00575JUD___040617____*
14+LCO No. 4262
15+
16+*04262SB00575JUD*
17+
18+Referred to Committee on JUDICIARY
19+
20+Introduced by:
21+
22+(JUD)
1123
1224 AN ACT CONCERNING PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES OF THE RISK REDUCTION CREDIT PROGRAM.
1325
1426 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:
1527
1628 Section 1. Section 18-98e of the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective October 1, 2017):
1729
18-(a) Notwithstanding any provision of the general statutes, any person sentenced to a term of imprisonment for a crime committed on or after October 1, 1994, and committed to the custody of the Commissioner of Correction on or after said date, except a person who is sentenced for a violation of section 53a-54a, 53a-54b, 53a-54c, 53a-54d, 53a-55, 53a-55a, 53a-59, 53a-59a, 53a-59c, 53a-70, 53a-70a, 53a-70c or 53a-100aa, or is a persistent dangerous felony offender or persistent dangerous sexual offender pursuant to section 53a-40, may be eligible to earn risk reduction credit toward a reduction of such person's sentence, in an amount not to exceed five days per month, at the discretion of the Commissioner of Correction for conduct as provided in subsection (b) of this section occurring on or after April 1, 2006.
30+(a) Notwithstanding any provision of the general statutes, any person sentenced to a term of imprisonment for a crime committed on or after October 1, 1994, and committed to the custody of the Commissioner of Correction on or after said date, except a person sentenced for a violation of section 53a-54a, 53a-54b, 53a-54c, 53a-54d, 53a-55, 53a-55a, 53a-70a, 53a-70c or 53a-100aa, or is a persistent dangerous felony offender or persistent dangerous sexual offender pursuant to section 53a-40, may be eligible to earn risk reduction credit toward a reduction of such person's sentence, in an amount not to exceed five days per month, at the discretion of the Commissioner of Correction for conduct as provided in subsection (b) of this section occurring on or after April 1, 2006.
1931
2032 (b) An inmate may earn risk reduction credit for adherence to the inmate's offender accountability plan, for participation in eligible programs and activities, and for good conduct and obedience to institutional rules as designated by the commissioner, provided (1) good conduct and obedience to institutional rules alone shall not entitle an inmate to such credit, and (2) the commissioner or the commissioner's designee may, in his or her discretion, cause the loss of all or any portion of such earned risk reduction credit for any act of misconduct or insubordination or refusal to conform to recommended programs or activities or institutional rules occurring at any time during the service of the sentence or for other good cause. If an inmate has not earned sufficient risk reduction credit at the time the commissioner or the commissioner's designee orders the loss of all or a portion of earned credit, such loss shall be deducted from any credit earned by such inmate in the future.
2133
2234 (c) The award of risk reduction credit earned for conduct occurring prior to July 1, 2011, shall be phased in consistent with public safety, risk reduction, administrative purposes and sound correctional practice, at the discretion of the commissioner, but shall be completed not later than July 1, 2012.
2335
2436 (d) Any credit earned under this section may only be earned during the period of time that the inmate is sentenced to a term of imprisonment and committed to the custody of the commissioner and may not be transferred or applied to a subsequent term of imprisonment. In no event shall any credit earned under this section be applied by the commissioner so as to reduce a mandatory minimum term of imprisonment such inmate is required to serve by statute.
2537
2638 (e) Prior to release of any inmate whose sentence is being reduced due to risk reduction credits earned pursuant to this section, the warden of the correctional facility from which such inmate is to be released shall review such inmate's records and verify that the inmate earned the risk reduction credits being applied to reduce such inmate's sentence.
2739
28-(f) [The] Not later than January 1, 2018, the commissioner shall adopt regulations in accordance with the provisions of chapter 54 detailing the internal policies and procedures to determine the amount of credit and whether an inmate may earn such credit toward a reduction in his or her sentence and to phase in the awarding of retroactive credit authorized by subsection (c) of this section. Such regulations shall include (1) a formula to calculate the credits an inmate may earn, and (2) provisions concerning (A) an inmate's ability to earn such credits, (B) a review of the credits earned and the calculation applied to the sentence of an inmate prior to discharge of the inmate, (C) forfeiture or rescission of earned credits, and (D) exclusion of an inmate from the opportunity to earn such credits.
40+(f) [The] Not later than January 1, 2018, the commissioner shall adopt regulations in accordance with the provisions of chapter 54 detailing the internal policies and procedures to determine the amount of credit and whether an inmate may earn such credit toward a reduction in his or her sentence and to phase in the awarding of retroactive credit authorized by subsection (c) of this section. Such regulations shall include (1) a formula to calculate the credits an inmate may earn, and (2) provisions (A) affecting an inmate's ability to earn such credits, (B) concerning a review of the credits earned and the calculation applied to the sentence of an inmate prior to discharge of the inmate, (C) concerning forfeiture or rescission of earned credits, and (D) concerning exclusion of an inmate from the opportunity to earn such credits.
2941
3042
3143
3244
3345 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
3446 Section 1 October 1, 2017 18-98e
3547
3648 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
3749
3850 Section 1
3951
4052 October 1, 2017
4153
4254 18-98e
4355
56+Statement of Purpose:
57+
58+To require the Department of Correction to adopt regulations pursuant to the risk reduction credit program rather than administer the program using uncodified internal procedures.
59+
60+[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.]
4461
4562
46-JUD Joint Favorable Subst.
4763
48-JUD
64+Co-Sponsors: SEN. FASANO, 34th Dist.
4965
50-Joint Favorable Subst.
66+Co-Sponsors:
67+
68+SEN. FASANO, 34th Dist.
69+
70+S.B. 575