Senate | 04/21/2017 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/28/2017 | File Number 268 | ||
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 155 | ||
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/17 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/10/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/02/2017 | Public Hearing 03/06 | ||
Senate | 03/01/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment | ||
Senate | 02/28/2017 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/08/2017 | Vote to Draft |