Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
Bill Placed on Senate Agenda, Senate Agenda Never Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
Disagreeing Action, Tabled for Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 8988
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
Amendment Withdrawn, House Amendment Schedule A 8916
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
House Calendar Number 594
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6805
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
File Number 436
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
Senate Calendar Number 231
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2017
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/17 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2017
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2017
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2017
|
Public Hearing 03/13
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2017
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2017
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2017
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|