Senate | 05/05/2017 | House Calendar Number 470 | ||
Senate | 05/05/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6632 | ||
Senate | 04/20/2017 | File Number 670 | ||
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 352 | ||
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/13/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/17 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Public Hearing 03/24 | ||
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/13/2017 | Drafted by Committee | ||
Senate | 02/15/2017 | Vote to Draft |