Senate | 06/03/2017 | House Calendar Number 629 | ||
Senate | 06/03/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 06/01/2017 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 06/01/2017 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 06/01/2017 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7258 | ||
Senate | 03/09/2017 | File Number 32 | ||
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 67 | ||
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/09/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/03/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/08/17 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 02/23/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 02/22/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 01/30/2017 | Public Hearing 02/03 | ||
Senate | 01/27/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |