Senate | 06/03/2017 | House Calendar Number 635 | ||
Senate | 06/03/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 06/02/2017 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 06/02/2017 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8396 | ||
Senate | 04/25/2017 | File Number 709 | ||
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Senate Calendar Number 388 | ||
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/24/17 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/07/2017 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/07/2017 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/23/2017 | Public Hearing 02/27 | ||
Senate | 02/22/2017 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |