House | 03/26/2018 | File Number 40 | ||
House | 03/26/2018 | House Calendar Number 60 | ||
House | 03/26/2018 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/26/2018 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/19/2018 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/18 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/15/2018 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/14/2018 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/23/2018 | Public Hearing 02/27 | ||
House | 02/22/2018 | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |