House | 05/03/2018 | Bill Passed Temporarily | ||
House | 05/03/2018 | House Designated House Amendment Schedule A 3619 | ||
House | 04/03/2018 | File Number 151 | ||
House | 04/03/2018 | House Calendar Number 122 | ||
House | 04/03/2018 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/03/2018 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/26/2018 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/18 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/16/2018 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/15/2018 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/02/2018 | Public Hearing 03/06 | ||
House | 03/01/2018 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |