Senate | 03/29/2018 | File Number 133 | ||
Senate | 03/29/2018 | Senate Calendar Number 108 | ||
Senate | 03/29/2018 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/29/2018 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/23/2018 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/18 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/15/2018 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/15/2018 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/23/2018 | Public Hearing 02/27 | ||
Senate | 02/22/2018 | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |