Connecticut 2018 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00451 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 General Assembly Raised Bill No. 451
22 February Session, 2018 LCO No. 2098
33 *02098_______ED_*
44 Referred to Committee on EDUCATION
55 Introduced by:
66 (ED)
77
88 General Assembly
99
1010 Raised Bill No. 451
1111
1212 February Session, 2018
1313
1414 LCO No. 2098
1515
1616 *02098_______ED_*
1717
1818 Referred to Committee on EDUCATION
1919
2020 Introduced by:
2121
2222 (ED)
2323
2424 AN ACT CONCERNING THE MINIMUM BUDGET REQUIREMENT.
2525
2626 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:
2727
2828 Section 1. Subsection (b) of section 10-262j of the 2018 supplement to the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2018):
2929
3030 (b) Except as otherwise provided under the provisions of subsections (c) to (e), inclusive, of this section, for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2019, the budgeted appropriation for education shall be not less than the sum of (1) the budgeted appropriation for education for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2018, [plus] minus the amount of any reduction to the equalization aid grant of the town during the fiscal year ending June 30, 2018, as a result of reductions in allotments pursuant to section 13 or 14 of public act 17-2 of the June special session or withholding or reductions of state financial assistance pursuant to subsection (d) of section 12-170f, and (2) any aid increase received pursuant to subsection (d) of section 10-262i, except that a town may reduce its budgeted appropriation for education for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2019, by one or more of the following:
3131
3232 [(1)] (A) If a town experiences an aid reduction, as described in subsection (d) of section 10-262i, such town may reduce its budgeted appropriation for education in an amount equal to the aid reduction;
3333
3434 [(2)] (B) Any district with [(A)] (i) a resident student population in which the number of students who are eligible for free or reduced price lunches pursuant to federal law and regulations is equal to or greater than twenty per cent, and [(B)] (ii) a resident student count for October 1, 2017, using the data of record as of January 31, 2018, that is lower than such district's resident student count for October 1, 2016, using the data of record as of January 31, 2018, may reduce such district's budgeted appropriation for education by the difference in the number of resident students for such years multiplied by fifty per cent of the net current expenditures per resident student of such district, provided such reduction shall not exceed one and one-half per cent of the district's budgeted appropriation for education for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2018, except that the Commissioner of Education may, following a review of a town's proposed reductions to its budgeted appropriation for education, permit a town to reduce its budgeted appropriation for education in an amount greater than one and one-half per cent if the board of education for such town has approved, by vote at a meeting duly called, such proposed reductions;
3535
3636 [(3)] (C) Any district with [(A)] (i) a resident student population in which the number of students who are eligible for free or reduced price lunches pursuant to federal law and regulations is less than twenty per cent, and [(B)] (ii) a resident student count for October 1, 2017, using the data of record as of January 31, 2018, that is lower than such district's resident student count for October 1, 2016, using the data of record as of January 31, 2018, may reduce such district's budgeted appropriation for education by the difference in the number of resident students for such years multiplied by fifty per cent of the net current expenditures per resident student, as defined in subdivision (45) of section 10-262f, of such district, provided such reduction shall not exceed three per cent of the district's budgeted appropriation for education for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2018, except that the Commissioner of Education may, following a review of a town's proposed reductions to its budgeted appropriation for education, permit a town to reduce its budgeted appropriation for education in an amount greater than three per cent if the board of education for such town has approved, by vote at a meeting duly called, such proposed reductions;
3737
3838 [(4)] (D) Any district [(A)] (i) that does not maintain a high school and pays tuition to another school district pursuant to section 10-33 for resident students to attend high school in another district, and [(B)] (ii) in which the number of resident students attending high school for such district for October 1, 2017, using the data of record as of January 31, 2018, is lower than such district's number of resident students attending high school for October 1, 2016, using the data of record as of January 31, 2018, may reduce such district's budgeted appropriation for education by the difference in the number of resident students attending high school for such years multiplied by the amount of tuition paid per student pursuant to section 10-33; or
3939
4040 [(5)] (E) Any district that realizes new and documentable savings through increased district efficiencies approved by the Commissioner of Education or through regional collaboration or cooperative arrangements pursuant to section 10-158a may reduce such district's budgeted appropriation for education in an amount equal to half of the amount of savings experienced as a result of such district efficiencies, regional collaboration or cooperative arrangement, provided such reduction shall not exceed one-half of one per cent of the district's budgeted appropriation for education for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2017.
4141
4242
4343
4444
4545 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
4646 Section 1 July 1, 2018 10-262j(b)
4747
4848 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
4949
5050 Section 1
5151
5252 July 1, 2018
5353
5454 10-262j(b)
5555
5656 Statement of Purpose:
5757
5858 To allow a board of education to reduce its budgeted appropriation for education in an amount equal to any reductions in its education cost sharing grant during the fiscal year ending June 30, 2018.
5959
6060 [Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.]