Connecticut 2018 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00451 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/06/2018

                            General Assembly  Raised Bill No. 451
February Session, 2018  LCO No. 2098
 *02098_______ED_*
Referred to Committee on EDUCATION
Introduced by:
(ED)

General Assembly

Raised Bill No. 451 

February Session, 2018

LCO No. 2098

*02098_______ED_*

Referred to Committee on EDUCATION 

Introduced by:

(ED)

AN ACT CONCERNING THE MINIMUM BUDGET REQUIREMENT.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:

Section 1. Subsection (b) of section 10-262j of the 2018 supplement to the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2018):

(b) Except as otherwise provided under the provisions of subsections (c) to (e), inclusive, of this section, for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2019, the budgeted appropriation for education shall be not less than the sum of (1) the budgeted appropriation for education for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2018, [plus] minus the amount of any reduction to the equalization aid grant of the town during the fiscal year ending June 30, 2018, as a result of reductions in allotments pursuant to section 13 or 14 of public act 17-2 of the June special session or withholding or reductions of state financial assistance pursuant to subsection (d) of section 12-170f, and (2) any aid increase received pursuant to subsection (d) of section 10-262i, except that a town may reduce its budgeted appropriation for education for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2019, by one or more of the following:

[(1)] (A) If a town experiences an aid reduction, as described in subsection (d) of section 10-262i, such town may reduce its budgeted appropriation for education in an amount equal to the aid reduction;

[(2)] (B) Any district with [(A)] (i) a resident student population in which the number of students who are eligible for free or reduced price lunches pursuant to federal law and regulations is equal to or greater than twenty per cent, and [(B)] (ii) a resident student count for October 1, 2017, using the data of record as of January 31, 2018, that is lower than such district's resident student count for October 1, 2016, using the data of record as of January 31, 2018, may reduce such district's budgeted appropriation for education by the difference in the number of resident students for such years multiplied by fifty per cent of the net current expenditures per resident student of such district, provided such reduction shall not exceed one and one-half per cent of the district's budgeted appropriation for education for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2018, except that the Commissioner of Education may, following a review of a town's proposed reductions to its budgeted appropriation for education, permit a town to reduce its budgeted appropriation for education in an amount greater than one and one-half per cent if the board of education for such town has approved, by vote at a meeting duly called, such proposed reductions;

[(3)] (C) Any district with [(A)] (i) a resident student population in which the number of students who are eligible for free or reduced price lunches pursuant to federal law and regulations is less than twenty per cent, and [(B)] (ii) a resident student count for October 1, 2017, using the data of record as of January 31, 2018, that is lower than such district's resident student count for October 1, 2016, using the data of record as of January 31, 2018, may reduce such district's budgeted appropriation for education by the difference in the number of resident students for such years multiplied by fifty per cent of the net current expenditures per resident student, as defined in subdivision (45) of section 10-262f, of such district, provided such reduction shall not exceed three per cent of the district's budgeted appropriation for education for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2018, except that the Commissioner of Education may, following a review of a town's proposed reductions to its budgeted appropriation for education, permit a town to reduce its budgeted appropriation for education in an amount greater than three per cent if the board of education for such town has approved, by vote at a meeting duly called, such proposed reductions;

[(4)] (D) Any district [(A)] (i) that does not maintain a high school and pays tuition to another school district pursuant to section 10-33 for resident students to attend high school in another district, and [(B)] (ii) in which the number of resident students attending high school for such district for October 1, 2017, using the data of record as of January 31, 2018, is lower than such district's number of resident students attending high school for October 1, 2016, using the data of record as of January 31, 2018, may reduce such district's budgeted appropriation for education by the difference in the number of resident students attending high school for such years multiplied by the amount of tuition paid per student pursuant to section 10-33; or

[(5)] (E) Any district that realizes new and documentable savings through increased district efficiencies approved by the Commissioner of Education or through regional collaboration or cooperative arrangements pursuant to section 10-158a may reduce such district's budgeted appropriation for education in an amount equal to half of the amount of savings experienced as a result of such district efficiencies, regional collaboration or cooperative arrangement, provided such reduction shall not exceed one-half of one per cent of the district's budgeted appropriation for education for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2017.

 


This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
Section 1 July 1, 2018 10-262j(b)

This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:

Section 1

July 1, 2018

10-262j(b)

Statement of Purpose: 

To allow a board of education to reduce its budgeted appropriation for education in an amount equal to any reductions in its education cost sharing grant during the fiscal year ending June 30, 2018.

[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.]