House | 04/19/2019 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/19/2019 | No New File by Committee on Planning and Development | ||
House | 04/18/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/18/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 04/10/2019 | Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development | ||
House | 04/04/2019 | File Number 386 | ||
House | 04/04/2019 | House Calendar Number 239 | ||
House | 04/04/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/29/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM | ||
House | 02/27/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security | ||
House | 02/26/2019 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/19/2019 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/08/2019 | Public Hearing 02/14 | ||
House | 02/07/2019 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |