House
|
07/01/2019
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2019
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2019
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/24/2019
|
Public Act 19-133
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2019
|
File Number 998
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2019
|
Senate Calendar Number 619
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8789
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2019
|
File Number 269
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2019
|
House Calendar Number 175
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2019
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2019
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2019
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2019
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2019
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2019
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2019
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2019
|
Public Hearing 02/07
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2019
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|