House | 04/09/2019 | File Number 553 | ||
House | 04/09/2019 | House Calendar Number 335 | ||
House | 04/09/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/09/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/03/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/28/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/25/2019 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/22/2019 | Public Hearing 03/01 | ||
House | 02/21/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment | ||
House | 02/20/2019 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/11/2019 | Vote to Draft |