House | 07/01/2019 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/27/2019 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 06/27/2019 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/24/2019 | Special Act 19-21 | ||
House | 06/05/2019 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 06/05/2019 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 04/25/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 401 | ||
House | 04/25/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/23/2019 | House Passed | ||
House | 03/25/2019 | File Number 114 | ||
House | 03/25/2019 | House Calendar Number 92 | ||
House | 03/25/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/25/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/18/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/19 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/08/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/07/2019 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/06/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Children | ||
House | 03/05/2019 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/21/2019 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/08/2019 | Public Hearing 02/14 | ||
House | 02/05/2019 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |