House | 05/14/2019 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/14/2019 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 05/14/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/14/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/13/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 05/10/2019 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 04/18/2019 | File Number 748 | ||
House | 04/18/2019 | House Calendar Number 446 | ||
House | 04/18/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/12/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/19 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/08/2019 | Public Hearing 03/13 | ||
House | 03/07/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections | ||
House | 03/06/2019 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/15/2019 | Vote to Draft |