House | 04/10/2019 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 04/04/2019 | File Number 395 | ||
House | 04/04/2019 | House Calendar Number 248 | ||
House | 04/04/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/04/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/29/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/21/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/20/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/18/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation | ||
House | 03/15/2019 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 03/08/2019 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/28/2019 | Public Hearing 03/04 | ||
House | 02/07/2019 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |