House | 04/10/2019 | File Number 571 | ||
House | 04/10/2019 | House Calendar Number 344 | ||
House | 04/10/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/10/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/04/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/19 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/26/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/25/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/25/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development | ||
House | 03/22/2019 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 03/15/2019 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 03/04/2019 | Public Hearing 03/08 | ||
House | 02/22/2019 | Public Hearing 02/27 | ||
House | 02/13/2019 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing | ||
House | 02/06/2019 | Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Planning and Development | ||
House | 02/06/2019 | Change of Reference, House to Committee on Planning and Development | ||
House | 01/31/2019 | Change of Reference Planning and Development | ||
House | 01/24/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |