House | 04/02/2019 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 03/28/2019 | File Number 180 | ||
House | 03/28/2019 | House Calendar Number 130 | ||
House | 03/28/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/28/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/22/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/18/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/14/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/13/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement | ||
House | 03/12/2019 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2019 | Public Hearing 02/14 | ||
House | 01/31/2019 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |