House | 07/08/2019 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/24/2019 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 06/24/2019 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/20/2019 | Public Act 19-104 | ||
House | 06/05/2019 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 05/24/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 607 | ||
House | 05/24/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/22/2019 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/03/2019 | File Number 337 | ||
House | 04/03/2019 | House Calendar Number 215 | ||
House | 04/03/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/03/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/28/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/19 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/18/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/15/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/01/2019 | Public Hearing 03/06 | ||
House | 02/28/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development | ||
House | 02/27/2019 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 01/30/2019 | Vote to Draft |