House | 04/15/2019 | File Number 652 | ||
House | 04/15/2019 | House Calendar Number 397 | ||
House | 04/15/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/15/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/08/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/19 10:00 AM | ||
House | 04/02/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/29/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/28/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health | ||
House | 03/27/2019 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 03/01/2019 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/07/2019 | Public Hearing 02/11 | ||
House | 02/01/2019 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |