House
|
06/28/2019
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/24/2019
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/24/2019
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2019
|
Public Act 19-107
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Senate Calendar Number 538
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
House Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
File Number 469
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
House Calendar Number 294
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2019
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2019
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2019
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2019
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2019
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2019
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2019
|
Public Hearing 02/21
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2019
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2019
|
Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2019
|
Change of Reference, House to Committee on Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2019
|
Change of Reference Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2019
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|