House | 04/04/2019 | File Number 400 | ||
House | 04/04/2019 | House Calendar Number 252 | ||
House | 04/04/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/04/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/29/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/25/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/22/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/06/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health | ||
House | 03/05/2019 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 03/01/2019 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/07/2019 | Public Hearing 02/11 | ||
House | 02/01/2019 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |