House
|
05/22/2019
|
File Number 961
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
Senate Calendar Number 576
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8166
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2019
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2019
|
Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2019
|
File Number 572
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2019
|
House Calendar Number 345
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2019
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/19 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2019
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2019
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2019
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2019
|
Public Hearing 02/25
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2019
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|