House | 04/17/2019 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 04/08/2019 | File Number 472 | ||
House | 04/08/2019 | House Calendar Number 297 | ||
House | 04/08/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/08/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/01/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/21/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/19/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/01/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security | ||
House | 02/28/2019 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/19/2019 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/08/2019 | Public Hearing 02/14 | ||
House | 02/07/2019 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |