House | 05/10/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 482 | ||
House | 05/10/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/08/2019 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/04/2019 | File Number 404 | ||
House | 04/04/2019 | House Calendar Number 256 | ||
House | 04/04/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/04/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/29/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/21/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/20/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/22/2019 | Public Hearing 02/27 | ||
House | 02/21/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation | ||
House | 02/20/2019 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2019 | Vote to Draft |