House
|
04/25/2019
|
Senate Calendar Number 419
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2019
|
House Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
File Number 473
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
House Calendar Number 298
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2019
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2019
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2019
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2019
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2019
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2019
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2019
|
Public Hearing 02/21
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2019
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2019
|
Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2019
|
Change of Reference, House to Committee on Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2019
|
Change of Reference Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2019
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology
|
|
|