Connecticut 2019 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06637 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 28, 2019

Chaptered

Bill June 26, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 14, 2019
Bill March 28, 2019
Bill February 20, 2019