House | 07/12/2019 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/27/2019 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 06/27/2019 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/24/2019 | Public Act 19-141 | ||
House | 06/05/2019 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 06/05/2019 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 04/25/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 415 | ||
House | 04/25/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/24/2019 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/11/2019 | File Number 613 | ||
House | 04/11/2019 | House Calendar Number 367 | ||
House | 04/11/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/11/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/05/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/19 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/01/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/29/2019 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/22/2019 | Public Hearing 02/27 | ||
House | 02/21/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections | ||
House | 02/20/2019 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2019 | Vote to Draft |