House | 05/14/2019 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/14/2019 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 05/14/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/14/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/13/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 05/10/2019 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 04/25/2019 | File Number 777 | ||
House | 04/25/2019 | House Calendar Number 485 | ||
House | 04/25/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/18/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/24/19 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/29/2019 | Public Hearing 04/03 | ||
House | 03/26/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 03/25/2019 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/15/2019 | Vote to Draft |