House | 05/01/2019 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/01/2019 | No New File by Committee on Education | ||
House | 04/30/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 04/30/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/30/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/23/2019 | Referred by House to Committee on Education | ||
House | 03/28/2019 | File Number 188 | ||
House | 03/28/2019 | House Calendar Number 138 | ||
House | 03/28/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/22/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/19 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/12/2019 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/01/2019 | Public Hearing 02/07 | ||
House | 01/31/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |