House
|
07/09/2019
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2019
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2019
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/24/2019
|
Public Act 19-148
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
File Number 905
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
Senate Calendar Number 499
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8590
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2019
|
File Number 27
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2019
|
House Calendar Number 34
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2019
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2019
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/06/19 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2019
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2019
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2019
|
Public Hearing 02/14
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2019
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs
|
|
|