Connecticut 2019 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB07064 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 06/24/2019

                             
 
 
House Bill No. 7064 
 
Public Act No. 19-148 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING MU	NICIPAL VETERANS' 
REPRESENTATIVES. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. Subsection (b) of section 27-135 of the general statutes is 
repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective 
October 1, 2019): 
(b) (1) Any city or town that has not established its own local 
veterans' advisory committee separate from one or more other cities or 
towns pursuant to subsection (a) of this section and does not otherwise 
provide funding for a veterans' service officer shall designate (A) a city 
or town employee, or (B) a volunteer who is a resident of such city or 
town, and (i) is a veteran, as defined in subsection (a) of section 27-103, 
or (ii) has practical experience handling veterans' issues, to serve as a 
[veterans' service contact person] municipal veterans' representative in 
such city or town. The Commissioner of Veterans Affairs shall 
annually send to the chief executive officer of any such city or town an 
electronic notification of such chief executive officer's duty to so 
designate a city or town employee or volunteer in accordance with this 
subsection. Such chief executive officer shall, not later than thirty days 
after receipt of such notification, submit to the Office of Advocacy and 
Assistance, as described in subsection (b) of section 27-102l, as  House Bill No. 7064 
 
Public Act No. 19-148 	2 of 4 
 
amended by this act, the name and electronic mail address of the city 
or town employee or volunteer so designated. As used in this 
subdivision, "chief executive officer" means the officer described in 
section 7-193. 
(2) [Any city or town employee designated as a veterans' service 
contact person] Each municipal veterans' representative shall carry out 
the duties described in subsection (a) of this section and shall complete 
a training course conducted by the Office of Advocacy and Assistance, 
as described in subdivision (3) of subsection (b) of section 27-102l, as 
amended by this act, or attend a training session conducted by the 
manager of said office, as described in subparagraph (A) of 
subdivision (2) of subsection (b) of said section. [Each employee so 
designated prior to July 1, 2016, shall complete such training course 
prior to January 1, 2017. Each employee so] Each municipal veterans' 
representative designated on or after [July 1, 2016] October 1, 2019, 
shall complete such training course not later than one year after the 
date of such designation. Upon completion of such training course, a 
[veterans' service contact person] municipal veterans' representative 
may thereafter receive electronically any new or updated training 
information from the Office of Advocacy and Assistance and shall not 
be required to complete any other such training course.  
(3) Any volunteer designated as a municipal veterans' 
representative by a city or town pursuant to subdivision (1) of this 
subsection shall (A) be available to veterans in person, by telephone or 
by electronic mail for any minimum number of hours per week that 
the city or town designating the volunteer may establish, and (B) file a 
performance report each month with the city or town designating the 
volunteer that includes, but is not limited to, the names of veterans 
assisted, services or referrals provided and any other information as 
determined by the city or town. 
Sec. 2. Subdivisions (1) to (3), inclusive, of subsection (b) of section  House Bill No. 7064 
 
Public Act No. 19-148 	3 of 4 
 
27-102l of the general statutes are repealed and the following is 
substituted in lieu thereof (Effective October 1, 2019): 
(b) (1) The commissioner may appoint a manager to administer an 
Office of Advocacy and Assistance for the aid and benefit of veterans 
and their spouses, eligible dependents and family members. The office 
shall have a staff of not less than eight men and women, including six 
veterans' service officers, and clerical personnel. The manager and 
veterans' service officers shall be veterans, as defined in subsection (a) 
of section 27-103, or veterans who were awarded the armed forces 
expeditionary medal for service by the armed forces. 
(2) (A) The manager shall develop a training module on assisting 
and serving women veterans with regard to state or federal services or 
benefits and identifying and advising such veterans of community or 
nonprofit programs focused on assisting and serving such veterans. 
The manager shall hold and provide instruction for an annual training 
session, in accordance with such module, to each veterans' [services] 
service officer and any [veterans' service contact person] municipal 
veterans' representative, as described in subsection (b) of section 27-
135, as amended by this act, or representative from an Operation 
Academic Support for Incoming Service Members center at a public 
institution of higher education in this state. 
(B) At least one of the veterans' service officers shall be a woman 
having a demonstrated interest in the concerns of women veterans, 
who shall be responsible for addressing those concerns, and, effective 
upon the next opening of a veterans' service officer position occurring 
on or after July 1, 2010, at least two of the veterans' service officers 
shall be individuals having bilingual proficiency in English and 
Spanish, within existing authorized positions. Each veterans' service 
officer shall (i) successfully complete a course in veterans' benefits not 
later than one year after commencement of employment, (ii) attend the 
training session described in subparagraph (A) of this subdivision, and  House Bill No. 7064 
 
Public Act No. 19-148 	4 of 4 
 
(iii) be assigned to one of the five congressional districts of the state. 
(3) The office staff shall, at least twice annually, conduct a training 
course for any [city or town employee designated a veterans' service 
contact person pursuant to subsection (b) of section 27-135] municipal 
veterans' representative. The office staff shall include in such training 
course a summary of state and federal services and benefits, the duties 
to be carried out by each [veterans' service contact person] municipal 
veterans' representative, as described in subsection (a) of section 27-
135, and any assistance the office staff may provide to any [veterans' 
service contact person] municipal veterans' representative related to 
such duties.