1 | 1 | | |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | LCO No. 3702 1 of 3 |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | General Assembly Raised Bill No. 7073 |
---|
6 | 6 | | January Session, 2019 |
---|
7 | 7 | | LCO No. 3702 |
---|
8 | 8 | | |
---|
9 | 9 | | |
---|
10 | 10 | | Referred to Committee on AGING |
---|
11 | 11 | | |
---|
12 | 12 | | |
---|
13 | 13 | | Introduced by: |
---|
14 | 14 | | (AGE) |
---|
15 | 15 | | |
---|
16 | 16 | | |
---|
17 | 17 | | |
---|
18 | 18 | | |
---|
19 | 19 | | AN ACT EXPANDING THE CONNECTICUT HOME-CARE PROGRAM |
---|
20 | 20 | | FOR THE ELDERLY. |
---|
21 | 21 | | Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General |
---|
22 | 22 | | Assembly convened: |
---|
23 | 23 | | |
---|
24 | 24 | | Section 1. Subsection (i) of section 17b-342 of the general statutes is 1 |
---|
25 | 25 | | repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 2 |
---|
26 | 26 | | 1, 2019): 3 |
---|
27 | 27 | | (i) (1) [On and after July 1, 2015, the] The Commissioner of Social 4 |
---|
28 | 28 | | Services shall, within available appropriations, administer a state-5 |
---|
29 | 29 | | funded portion of the program for persons (A) who are sixty-five years 6 |
---|
30 | 30 | | of age and older; (B) who are inappropriately institutionalized or at 7 |
---|
31 | 31 | | risk of inappropriate institutionalization; (C) whose income is less than 8 |
---|
32 | 32 | | or equal to the amount allowed under subdivision (3) of subsection (a) 9 |
---|
33 | 33 | | of this section; and (D) whose assets, if single, do not exceed [one 10 |
---|
34 | 34 | | hundred fifty per cent of the federal minimum community spouse 11 |
---|
35 | 35 | | protected amount pursuant to 42 USC 1396r-5(f)(2) or, if married, the 12 |
---|
36 | 36 | | couple's assets do not exceed two hundred per cent of said community 13 |
---|
37 | 37 | | spouse protected amount] forty thousand dollars or, if married, the 14 |
---|
38 | 38 | | couple's assets do not exceed sixty-five thousand dollars. For program 15 Raised Bill No. 7073 |
---|
39 | 39 | | |
---|
40 | 40 | | |
---|
41 | 41 | | |
---|
42 | 42 | | LCO No. 3702 2 of 3 |
---|
43 | 43 | | |
---|
44 | 44 | | applications received by the Department of Social Services for the 16 |
---|
45 | 45 | | fiscal years ending June 30, 2016, and June 30, 2017, only persons who 17 |
---|
46 | 46 | | require the level of care provided in a nursing home shall be eligible 18 |
---|
47 | 47 | | for the state-funded portion of the program, except for persons 19 |
---|
48 | 48 | | residing in affordable housing under the assisted living demonstration 20 |
---|
49 | 49 | | project established pursuant to section 17b-347e who are otherwise 21 |
---|
50 | 50 | | eligible in accordance with this section. 22 |
---|
51 | 51 | | (2) Except for persons residing in affordable housing under the 23 |
---|
52 | 52 | | assisted living demonstration project established pursuant to section 24 |
---|
53 | 53 | | 17b-347e, as provided in subdivision (3) of this subsection, any person 25 |
---|
54 | 54 | | whose income is at or below two hundred per cent of the federal 26 |
---|
55 | 55 | | poverty level and who is ineligible for Medicaid shall contribute [nine] 27 |
---|
56 | 56 | | seven per cent of the cost of his or her care. Any person whose income 28 |
---|
57 | 57 | | exceeds two hundred per cent of the federal poverty level shall 29 |
---|
58 | 58 | | contribute [nine] seven per cent of the cost of his or her care in 30 |
---|
59 | 59 | | addition to the amount of applied income determined in accordance 31 |
---|
60 | 60 | | with the methodology established by the Department of Social Services 32 |
---|
61 | 61 | | for recipients of medical assistance. Any person who does not 33 |
---|
62 | 62 | | contribute to the cost of care in accordance with this subdivision shall 34 |
---|
63 | 63 | | be ineligible to receive services under this subsection. Notwithstanding 35 |
---|
64 | 64 | | any provision of sections 17b-60 and 17b-61, the department shall not 36 |
---|
65 | 65 | | be required to provide an administrative hearing to a person found 37 |
---|
66 | 66 | | ineligible for services under this [subsection] subdivision because of a 38 |
---|
67 | 67 | | failure to contribute to the cost of care. 39 |
---|
68 | 68 | | (3) Any person who resides in affordable housing under the assisted 40 |
---|
69 | 69 | | living demonstration project established pursuant to section 17b-347e 41 |
---|
70 | 70 | | and whose income is at or below two hundred per cent of the federal 42 |
---|
71 | 71 | | poverty level, shall not be required to contribute to the cost of care. 43 |
---|
72 | 72 | | Any person who resides in affordable housing under the assisted 44 |
---|
73 | 73 | | living demonstration project established pursuant to section 17b-347e 45 |
---|
74 | 74 | | and whose income exceeds two hundred per cent of the federal 46 |
---|
75 | 75 | | poverty level, shall contribute to the applied income amount 47 |
---|
76 | 76 | | determined in accordance with the methodology established by the 48 |
---|
77 | 77 | | Department of Social Services for recipients of medical assistance. Any 49 Raised Bill No. 7073 |
---|
78 | 78 | | |
---|
79 | 79 | | |
---|
80 | 80 | | |
---|
81 | 81 | | LCO No. 3702 3 of 3 |
---|
82 | 82 | | |
---|
83 | 83 | | person whose income exceeds two hundred per cent of the federal 50 |
---|
84 | 84 | | poverty level and who does not contribute to the cost of care in 51 |
---|
85 | 85 | | accordance with this subdivision shall be ineligible to receive services 52 |
---|
86 | 86 | | under this subsection. Notwithstanding any provision of sections 17b-53 |
---|
87 | 87 | | 60 and 17b-61, the department shall not be required to provide an 54 |
---|
88 | 88 | | administrative hearing to a person found ineligible for services under 55 |
---|
89 | 89 | | this [subsection] subdivision because of a failure to contribute to the 56 |
---|
90 | 90 | | cost of care. 57 |
---|
91 | 91 | | (4) The annualized cost of services provided to an individual under 58 |
---|
92 | 92 | | the state-funded portion of the program shall not exceed fifty per cent 59 |
---|
93 | 93 | | of the weighted average cost of care in nursing homes in the state, 60 |
---|
94 | 94 | | except an individual who received services costing in excess of such 61 |
---|
95 | 95 | | amount under the Department of Social Services in the fiscal year 62 |
---|
96 | 96 | | ending June 30, 1992, may continue to receive such services, provided 63 |
---|
97 | 97 | | the annualized cost of such services does not exceed eighty per cent of 64 |
---|
98 | 98 | | the weighted average cost of such nursing home care. The 65 |
---|
99 | 99 | | commissioner may allow the cost of services provided to an individual 66 |
---|
100 | 100 | | to exceed the maximum cost established pursuant to this subdivision 67 |
---|
101 | 101 | | in a case of extreme hardship, as determined by the commissioner, 68 |
---|
102 | 102 | | provided in no case shall such cost exceed that of the weighted cost of 69 |
---|
103 | 103 | | such nursing home care. 70 |
---|
104 | 104 | | This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following |
---|
105 | 105 | | sections: |
---|
106 | 106 | | |
---|
107 | 107 | | Section 1 July 1, 2019 17b-342(i) |
---|
108 | 108 | | |
---|
109 | 109 | | Statement of Purpose: |
---|
110 | 110 | | To allow more senior citizens to age in place at home by expanding |
---|
111 | 111 | | income eligibility and reducing the cost share for the Connecticut |
---|
112 | 112 | | home-care program for the elderly. |
---|
113 | 113 | | [Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, |
---|
114 | 114 | | except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is |
---|
115 | 115 | | not underlined.] |
---|
116 | 116 | | |
---|