Connecticut 2019 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB07073 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/05/2019

                                
 
LCO No. 3702  	1 of 3 
 
General Assembly  Raised Bill No. 7073  
January Session, 2019  
LCO No. 3702 
 
 
Referred to Committee on AGING  
 
 
Introduced by:  
(AGE)  
 
 
 
 
AN ACT EXPANDING THE CONNECTICUT HOME-CARE PROGRAM 
FOR THE ELDERLY. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. Subsection (i) of section 17b-342 of the general statutes is 1 
repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 2 
1, 2019): 3 
(i) (1) [On and after July 1, 2015, the] The Commissioner of Social 4 
Services shall, within available appropriations, administer a state-5 
funded portion of the program for persons (A) who are sixty-five years 6 
of age and older; (B) who are inappropriately institutionalized or at 7 
risk of inappropriate institutionalization; (C) whose income is less than 8 
or equal to the amount allowed under subdivision (3) of subsection (a) 9 
of this section; and (D) whose assets, if single, do not exceed [one 10 
hundred fifty per cent of the federal minimum community spouse 11 
protected amount pursuant to 42 USC 1396r-5(f)(2) or, if married, the 12 
couple's assets do not exceed two hundred per cent of said community 13 
spouse protected amount] forty thousand dollars or, if married, the 14 
couple's assets do not exceed sixty-five thousand dollars. For program 15  Raised Bill No.  7073 
 
 
 
LCO No. 3702   	2 of 3 
 
applications received by the Department of Social Services for the 16 
fiscal years ending June 30, 2016, and June 30, 2017, only persons who 17 
require the level of care provided in a nursing home shall be eligible 18 
for the state-funded portion of the program, except for persons 19 
residing in affordable housing under the assisted living demonstration 20 
project established pursuant to section 17b-347e who are otherwise 21 
eligible in accordance with this section. 22 
(2) Except for persons residing in affordable housing under the 23 
assisted living demonstration project established pursuant to section 24 
17b-347e, as provided in subdivision (3) of this subsection, any person 25 
whose income is at or below two hundred per cent of the federal 26 
poverty level and who is ineligible for Medicaid shall contribute [nine] 27 
seven per cent of the cost of his or her care. Any person whose income 28 
exceeds two hundred per cent of the federal poverty level shall 29 
contribute [nine] seven per cent of the cost of his or her care in 30 
addition to the amount of applied income determined in accordance 31 
with the methodology established by the Department of Social Services 32 
for recipients of medical assistance. Any person who does not 33 
contribute to the cost of care in accordance with this subdivision shall 34 
be ineligible to receive services under this subsection. Notwithstanding 35 
any provision of sections 17b-60 and 17b-61, the department shall not 36 
be required to provide an administrative hearing to a person found 37 
ineligible for services under this [subsection] subdivision because of a 38 
failure to contribute to the cost of care. 39 
(3) Any person who resides in affordable housing under the assisted 40 
living demonstration project established pursuant to section 17b-347e 41 
and whose income is at or below two hundred per cent of the federal 42 
poverty level, shall not be required to contribute to the cost of care. 43 
Any person who resides in affordable housing under the assisted 44 
living demonstration project established pursuant to section 17b-347e 45 
and whose income exceeds two hundred per cent of the federal 46 
poverty level, shall contribute to the applied income amount 47 
determined in accordance with the methodology established by the 48 
Department of Social Services for recipients of medical assistance. Any 49  Raised Bill No.  7073 
 
 
 
LCO No. 3702   	3 of 3 
 
person whose income exceeds two hundred per cent of the federal 50 
poverty level and who does not contribute to the cost of care in 51 
accordance with this subdivision shall be ineligible to receive services 52 
under this subsection. Notwithstanding any provision of sections 17b-53 
60 and 17b-61, the department shall not be required to provide an 54 
administrative hearing to a person found ineligible for services under 55 
this [subsection] subdivision because of a failure to contribute to the 56 
cost of care. 57 
(4) The annualized cost of services provided to an individual under 58 
the state-funded portion of the program shall not exceed fifty per cent 59 
of the weighted average cost of care in nursing homes in the state, 60 
except an individual who received services costing in excess of such 61 
amount under the Department of Social Services in the fiscal year 62 
ending June 30, 1992, may continue to receive such services, provided 63 
the annualized cost of such services does not exceed eighty per cent of 64 
the weighted average cost of such nursing home care. The 65 
commissioner may allow the cost of services provided to an individual 66 
to exceed the maximum cost established pursuant to this subdivision 67 
in a case of extreme hardship, as determined by the commissioner, 68 
provided in no case shall such cost exceed that of the weighted cost of 69 
such nursing home care. 70 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 July 1, 2019 17b-342(i) 
 
Statement of Purpose:   
To allow more senior citizens to age in place at home by expanding 
income eligibility and reducing the cost share for the Connecticut 
home-care program for the elderly. 
[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, 
except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is 
not underlined.]