House
|
06/21/2019
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2019
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2019
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
Public Act 19-12
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2019
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2019
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2019
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2019
|
File Number 992
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2019
|
Senate Calendar Number 596
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8951
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2019
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2019
|
Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2019
|
File Number 614
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2019
|
House Calendar Number 368
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2019
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/19 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2019
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2019
|
Public Hearing 03/06
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2019
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Education
|
|
|