House
|
05/30/2019
|
File Number 1014
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2019
|
Senate Calendar Number 632
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2019
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2019
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9557
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2019
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2019
|
Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2019
|
File Number 615
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2019
|
House Calendar Number 369
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2019
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/19 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2019
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2019
|
Public Hearing 03/06
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2019
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Education
|
|
|