House | 05/22/2019 | File Number 965 | ||
House | 05/22/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 573 | ||
House | 05/22/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/20/2019 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 05/20/2019 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8643 | ||
House | 05/14/2019 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/14/2019 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 05/14/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/14/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/13/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 05/10/2019 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 03/19/2019 | File Number 70 | ||
House | 03/19/2019 | House Calendar Number 63 | ||
House | 03/19/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/12/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/19 5:00 PM | ||
House | 02/14/2019 | Public Hearing 02/19 | ||
House | 02/07/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |