Senate | 05/31/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 648 | ||
Senate | 05/31/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/30/2019 | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate | ||
House | 05/30/2019 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/04/2019 | File Number 414 | ||
House | 04/04/2019 | House Calendar Number 266 | ||
House | 04/04/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/04/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/29/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/21/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/20/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/11/2019 | Public Hearing 02/15 | ||
House | 02/07/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |