House | 04/22/2019 | No Action | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 03/07/2019 | File Number 34 | ||
House | 03/07/2019 | House Calendar Number 41 | ||
House | 03/07/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/07/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/01/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/06/19 5:00 PM | ||
House | 02/27/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 02/26/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/13/2019 | Public Hearing 02/19 | ||
House | 02/08/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |