House | 04/22/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 384 | ||
House | 04/22/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/02/2019 | File Number 284 | ||
House | 04/02/2019 | House Calendar Number 190 | ||
House | 04/02/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/02/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/26/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/21/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/20/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/11/2019 | Public Hearing 02/15 | ||
House | 02/08/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |