Senate | 07/12/2019 | Vetoed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 06/27/2019 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/27/2019 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 06/24/2019 | Public Act 19-138 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2019 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/05/2019 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 05/31/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 649 | ||
Senate | 05/31/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/30/2019 | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate | ||
House | 05/30/2019 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/04/2019 | File Number 415 | ||
House | 04/04/2019 | House Calendar Number 267 | ||
House | 04/04/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/04/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/29/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/21/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/20/2019 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 02/11/2019 | Public Hearing 02/15 | ||
House | 02/08/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |