House | 05/16/2019 | File Number 890 | ||
House | 05/16/2019 | House Calendar Number 595 | ||
House | 05/16/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/16/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/10/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/15/19 5:00 PM | ||
House | 05/03/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/02/2019 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/28/2019 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 03/28/2019 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 03/25/2019 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Appropriations | ||
House | 02/15/2019 | Public Hearing 02/22 | ||
House | 02/14/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |