House
|
07/09/2019
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2019
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2019
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/24/2019
|
Public Act 19-139
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2019
|
File Number 993
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2019
|
Senate Calendar Number 598
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 9470
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9342
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2019
|
File Number 576
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2019
|
House Calendar Number 349
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2019
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2019
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/19 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2019
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2019
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2019
|
Public Hearing 02/22
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2019
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Education
|
|
|