House | 03/18/2019 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 03/18/2019 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 03/18/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/15/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/12/2019 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations | ||
House | 02/15/2019 | Public Hearing 02/21 | ||
House | 02/14/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |