House
|
07/12/2019
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2019
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2019
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/25/2019
|
Public Act 19-162
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
File Number 811
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Senate Calendar Number 410
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2019
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2019
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7251
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
File Number 462
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
House Calendar Number 306
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2019
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2019
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2019
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2019
|
Public Hearing 02/27
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2019
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation
|
|
|