House
|
06/21/2019
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/19/2019
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/19/2019
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2019
|
Public Act 19-49
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2019
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2019
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Senate Calendar Number 412
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2019
|
House Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2019
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2019
|
No New File by Committee on Education
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2019
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2019
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2019
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2019
|
Referred by House to Committee on Education
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2019
|
File Number 424
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2019
|
House Calendar Number 276
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2019
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/19 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2019
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2019
|
Public Hearing 02/28
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2019
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services
|
|
|