House | 05/31/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 653 | ||
House | 05/31/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/29/2019 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | File Number 690 | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | House Calendar Number 426 | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/17/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/11/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/19 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/01/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/29/2019 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/08/2019 | Public Hearing 03/15 | ||
House | 02/21/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |