LCO \\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2019HB-07206-R01- HB.docx 1 of 5 General Assembly Substitute Bill No. 7206 January Session, 2019 AN ACT EXPANDING THE PROPERTY TAX EXEMPTI ON FOR CERTAIN RENEWABLE EN ERGY SOURCES AND HYDROPOWER FACILITIES. Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened: Section 1. Subdivision (57) of section 12-81 of the general statutes is 1 repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective 2 October 1, 2019, and applicable to assessment years commencing on or after 3 October 1, 2019): 4 (57) (A) (i) Any Class I renewable energy source, as defined in 5 section 16-1, or hydropower facility described in subdivision (21) of 6 subsection (a) of section 16-1, installed for the generation of electricity 7 where such electricity is intended for private residential use or on a 8 farm, as defined in subsection (q) of section 1-1, provided (I) such 9 installation occurs on or after October 1, 2007, [and further provided] 10 (II) the estimated annual production of such source or facility does not 11 exceed the estimated annual load for the location where such source or 12 facility is located, where such load and production are estimated as of 13 the date of installation of the source or facility as indicated in the 14 written application filed pursuant to subparagraph (E) of this 15 subdivision, and (III) such installation is for a single family dwelling, a 16 multifamily dwelling consisting of two to four units or a farm; [,] (ii) 17 any passive or active solar water or space heating system; [,] or (iii) any 18 Substitute Bill No. 7206 LCO {\\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2019HB-07206- R01-HB.docx } 2 of 5 geothermal energy resource. In the case of subparagraph (A)(i) of this 19 subdivision, the utilization of or participation in any net metering or 20 tariff policy or program implemented by the state or ownership of 21 such source or facility by a party other than the owner of the real 22 property upon which such source or facility is installed shall not 23 disqualify such source or facility from exemption pursuant to this 24 section. In the case of clause (ii) or (iii) of this subparagraph, such 25 exemption shall apply only to the amount by which the assessed 26 valuation of the real property equipped with such system or resource 27 exceeds the assessed valuation of such real property equipped with the 28 conventional portion of the system or resource; 29 (B) For assessment years commencing on and after October 1, 2013, 30 any Class I renewable energy source, as defined in section 16-1, 31 hydropower facility described in subdivision (21) of subsection (a) of 32 section 16-1, or solar thermal or geothermal renewable energy source, 33 installed for generation or displacement of energy, provided (i) such 34 installation occurs on or after January 1, 2010, (ii) such installation is 35 for commercial or industrial purposes, (iii) the nameplate capacity of 36 such source or facility does not exceed the load for the location where 37 such generation or displacement is located, and (iv) such source or 38 facility is located in a distressed municipality, as defined in section 32-39 9p, with a population between one hundred twenty-five thousand and 40 one hundred thirty-five thousand; 41 (C) For assessment years commencing on and after October 1, 2013, 42 any municipality may, upon approval by its legislative body or in any 43 town in which the legislative body is a town meeting, by the board of 44 selectmen, abate up to one hundred per cent of property tax for any 45 Class I renewable energy source, as defined in section 16-1, 46 hydropower facility described in subdivision (21) of subsection (a) of 47 section 16-1, or solar thermal or geothermal renewable energy source, 48 installed for generation or displacement of energy, provided (i) such 49 installation occurs between January 1, 2010, and December 31, 2013, (ii) 50 such installation is for commercial or industrial purposes, (iii) the 51 Substitute Bill No. 7206 LCO {\\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2019HB-07206- R01-HB.docx } 3 of 5 nameplate capacity of such source or facility does not exceed the load 52 for the location where such generation or displacement is located, and 53 (iv) such source or facility is not located in a municipality described in 54 subparagraph (B) of this subdivision; 55 (D) For assessment years commencing on and after October 1, 2014, 56 any (i) Class I renewable energy source, as defined in section 16-1, (ii) 57 hydropower facility described in subdivision (21) of subsection (a) of 58 section 16-1, or (iii) solar thermal or geothermal renewable energy 59 source, installed for generation or displacement of energy, provided (I) 60 such installation occurs on or after January 1, 2014, (II) is for 61 [commercial or industrial] nonresidential purposes, (III) the 62 [nameplate capacity] estimated annual production of such source or 63 facility does not exceed the estimated annual load for the location 64 where such generation or displacement is located or the aggregated 65 load of the beneficial accounts for any Class I renewable energy source 66 participating in virtual net metering pursuant to section 16-244u, 67 where such load and production are estimated as of the date of 68 installation of the source or facility as indicated in the written 69 application filed pursuant to subparagraph (E) of this subdivision, and 70 (IV) in the case of clause (iii) of this subparagraph, such exemption 71 shall apply only to the amount by which the assessed valuation of the 72 real property equipped with such source exceeds the assessed 73 valuation of such real property equipped with the conventional 74 portion of the source; 75 (E) Any person claiming the exemption provided in this subdivision 76 for any assessment year shall, on or before the first day of November 77 in such assessment year, file with the assessor or board of assessors in 78 the town in which such hydropower facility, Class I renewable energy 79 source, solar thermal or geothermal renewable energy source or 80 passive or active solar water or space heating system or geothermal 81 energy resource is located, a written application claiming such 82 exemption. Such application shall be made on a form prepared for 83 such purpose by the Secretary of the Office of Policy and Management, 84 Substitute Bill No. 7206 LCO {\\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2019HB-07206- R01-HB.docx } 4 of 5 and shall include, but not be limited to, a statement of the estimated 85 annual load and production of a source or facility described in 86 subparagraphs (A)(i) and (D) of this subdivision as of the date of the 87 installation of such source or facility. Said secretary shall make such 88 application available to the public on the Internet web site of the Office 89 of Policy and Management. Failure to file such application in the 90 manner and form as provided [by such assessor or board within the 91 time limit prescribed] by the secretary shall constitute a waiver of the 92 right to such exemption for such assessment year. Such application 93 shall not be required for any assessment year following that for which 94 the initial application is filed, provided if such hydropower facility, 95 Class I renewable energy source, solar thermal or geothermal 96 renewable energy source or passive or active solar water or space 97 heating system or geothermal energy resource is altered in a manner 98 which would require a building permit, such alteration shall be 99 deemed a waiver of the right to such exemption until a new 100 application, applicable with respect to such altered source, is filed and 101 the right to such exemption is established as required initially. In the 102 event that a person owns more than one such source or facility in a 103 municipality, such person may file a single application identifying 104 each such source or facility; 105 (F) For assessment years commencing on and after October 1, 2015, 106 any municipality may, by vote of its legislative body or, in a 107 municipality where the legislative body is a town meeting, by vote of 108 the board of selectmen, abate up to one hundred per cent of the 109 property taxes due for any tax year, for not longer than the term of the 110 power purchase agreement, with respect to any Class I renewable 111 energy source, as defined in section 16-1, that is the subject of such 112 power purchase agreement approved by the Public Utilities 113 Regulatory Authority pursuant to section 16a-3f; 114 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections: Substitute Bill No. 7206 LCO {\\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2019HB-07206- R01-HB.docx } 5 of 5 Section 1 October 1, 2019, and applicable to assessment years commencing on or after October 1, 2019 12-81(57) PD Joint Favorable Subst.