House | 05/20/2019 | File Number 939 | ||
House | 05/20/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 540 | ||
House | 05/20/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/16/2019 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 05/16/2019 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8610 | ||
House | 03/21/2019 | File Number 97 | ||
House | 03/21/2019 | House Calendar Number 87 | ||
House | 03/21/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/21/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/15/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/20/19 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/08/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/08/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/01/2019 | Public Hearing 03/06 | ||
House | 02/21/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |